Admiral z.V. Werner Tillessen (left), Chief of the Naval-Liaison-Staff Romania (18 December 1942-23 August 1944), inspecting members of a Harbour protection flotilla at a naval base (presumably in Romania), September 1943. The back of this press photo details a conversation that occured:
„As the crews filed out, the admiral suddenly came to a standstill, for in front of him was a Flügelmann, a giant of a sailor. „How tall are you?“ - „Two metres, Mr. Admiral!“ - „Are you the tallest in the German navy?“ - „Yes, Mr. Admiral!“ - „I suppose you need an extra bunk?“ - „Yes, Mr. Admiral!“ - The cheerful dialogue made everyone present smile.“
As part of his inspection tour of the South of the Eastern Front (which lasted from 7 September until 10 September 1942), the Commander in Chief of the Kriegsmarine, Großadmiral Erich Raeder, visited the Kriegsmarine Shipyard in Nikolayev (Ukraine) on 10 September 1942. The Senior Shipyard Director, Admiral z.V. Otto Feige, gave a lecture and then the group toured the Shipyard. The Heads of various services at the Shipyard also gave their report to the Commander in Chief, and the naval units mustered for inspection.
1: Großadmiral Erich Raeder, Commander-in-Chief of the Kriegsmarine (01 June 1935-30 January 1943)
2: Admiral z.V. Otto Feige, Senior Shipyard Director of the Kriegsmarine Shipyard Nikolayev (Ukraine) (01 December 1941-30 September 1942)
3: Admiral Karlgeorg Schuster, Commander-in-Chief of the Naval-Group-Command South (30 June 1941-20 March 1943)
4: Konteradmiral Hellmuth Heye, Chief of Staff of the Naval-Group-Command South (30 June 1941-14 September 1942)
Wehrmacht officers walking through a city in France (possibly Dieppe), 1941/1942.
1: Admiral Hermann von Fischel, Naval-Commander Channel Coast (20 February 1941-31 January 1943)
2: Korvettenkapitän Gustav Forstmann, Chief of the 1. Mine Sweeper Flotilla (27 November 1939-01 March 1942)
3: Kommodore Friedrich Ruge, Commander of Security West (17 February 1941-21 May 1943)
4: Generalmajor Konrad Haase, Commander of the 302nd Infantry-Division (12 November 1940-16 November 1942)
Kriegsmarine admirals inspecting the Battleship „Schleswig-Holstein“ in Wilhelmshaven, exact date unknown (sometime between October 1935 and May 1937).
1: Kapitän zur See Otto von Schrader, Fortress-Commandant of Wilhelmshaven (27 September 1934-30 September 1937)
2: Konteradmiral Hans-Herbert Stobwasser, II. Admiral of the North-Sea-Station (25 September 1935-30 September 1937)
3: Konteradmiral (Ing.) Hans Fechter, Ship-Machine-Inspector (01 October 1935-31 December 1939)
4: Konteradmiral Willy von Nordeck, Senior-Shipyard-Director of the Naval-Shipyard, from 12 November 1938 Kriegsmarine-Shipyard Wilhelmshaven (30 September 1935-22 June 1942)
5: Vizeadmiral Otto Feige, Inspector of Naval Artillery (30 September 1932-26 September 1937)
6: Kapitän zur See Günther Krause, Commandant of the Battleship „Schleswig-Holstein“ (07 October 1935-02 May 1937)
7: Admiral Otto Schultze, Commanding Admiral of the Naval-Station of the North Sea (04 July 1935-03 October 1937)
Inspection of the crew of the Battleship „Schleswig-Holstein“, 1943/1944.
1: Vizeadmiral August Thiele, Commander of Training-Formations of the Fleet (13 March 1943-18 September 1944)
2: Admiral Otto Schniewind, Fleet Chief (12 June 1941-30 July 1944), At the same time, Commander-in-Chief of the Naval-Group-Command North (02 March 1943-30 July 1944)
The previously posted photo (#209) was also taken on board the Battleship "Schleswig-Holstein" in 1943/1944.
Similar Threads
Bookmarks